Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from HHS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3312) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to HHS/CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 408).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1006-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 571-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-24 at 11:30AM in Conference Room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-09-24 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Re-referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to TRN/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|