Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Amended

Bill March 20, 2024
Bill March 2, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024