|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to HRE, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 270).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aiu voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1170) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 629) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|