Hawaii 2024 Regular Session

Hawaii House Bill HB2610 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill March 22, 2024
Bill March 14, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024