Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3162) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 3:03PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 162).
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kong voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Holt, Kila, Pierick, Souza voting no (5) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 857-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Ward; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kila; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Kong voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Souza voting no (3) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 133-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Souza; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|