House | 02/02/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LGO with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Gates, Kila, Nakashima excused (4). | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LGO. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd, Woodson. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 01-31-24 2:10PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to HET, LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Pending introduction. |