House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 167-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Souza.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to AGR/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|