12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Re-referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 11 | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-03-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to ECD, CPC, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Pending introduction. |