Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 5:45 PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:45 PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:00 PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 4:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 790).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Chair. Senator DeCoite discharged as Member; Added as Chair. Senator Richards added as Conferee.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 2:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 783).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Wakai discharged as Member; Added as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; DeCoite, Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Kitagawa, Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 710) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1777) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-23 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 127).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 806), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Recommitted to FIN with none voting no and Representative(s) Holt, Kong, Todd excused.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 779) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to FIN for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-17-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|