Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 217, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2024
|
Act 217, on 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1318).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick voting no (3) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 134-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 134-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Ichiyama, Poepoe, M. Mizuno, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, San Buenaventura, McKelvey, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 10:46AM in conference room 325.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 769).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; San Buenaventura, McKelvey, Lee Co-Chairs; Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 776).
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Ichiyama, Poepoe Co-Chairs; M. Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 665) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3806) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from AEN/HHS/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3293) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:01PM; CR 225.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN deferred the measure until 03-18-24 1:00PM; CR 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS will hold a public decision making on 03-18-24 1:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on AEN/HHS/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-24 1:00PM; CR 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to AEN/HHS/GVO, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 442).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Pierick voting no (3) and Representative(s) Cochran, Woodson excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1038-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden, Hashem.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Tuesday, 02-13-24 9:05AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to EEP/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|