House | 02/08/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Holt voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 160-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD. | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | The committee on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Tam, Garrett, Kapela, Matayoshi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Sayama. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Re-referred to CAI, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 5 | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |