Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EDU, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 445).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Matayoshi, Woodson excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 996-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Garrett, Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-23-24 1:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Ward excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 118-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-01-24 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|