House
|
02/08/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JHA with Representative(s) Amato, Chun, Garrett, Hussey-Burdick, Ichiyama, Kila, Matsumoto, Poepoe, Souza, Takayama voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kapela, Kobayashi, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Perruso, Pierick, Quinlan, Tam voting no (11) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4).
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) La Chica.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 10:30AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on ECD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 02-02-24 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to ECD, CPC/JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|