Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 446).
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Aiu, Kila voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cochran, Martinez, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-24.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1034-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Aiu, Kila; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-24 12:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 390-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:31AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-24.
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|