House | 02/08/2024 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 165-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-06-24 10:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 | ||
House | 01/26/2024 | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |