|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 540) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 01-31-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to TRN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|