House
|
02/28/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-28-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 511-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-14-24 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-24 11:30AM in conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-07-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-24 11:15 AM, House conference room 329.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-02-24 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|