Senate
|
05/31/2024
|
Act 041, 05/30/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2024
|
Act 041, on 05/30/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1141).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830).
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798).
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 139-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 139-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Kitagawa, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Wakai, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 2:30PM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 725).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Richards, Awa.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Nishimoto, Tam, Pierick.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2024
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 668) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
One Day Notice 04-09-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3819) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-24 10:20AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3348) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-21-24 10:30AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-20-24 9:35AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-24 9:44AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference (Proposed Draft).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
The committee on CPN has deleted the measure from decision making scheduled on 03-19-24 9:45AM; CR 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN deferred the measure until 03-19-24 9:45AM; Conference Room 229.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 9:30AM; CR 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred to CPN, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 65).
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 715-24), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-24 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Perruso, Takayama, Todd excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2024
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 590-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Sayama, Belatti, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Nakashima, Amato, Hashem, Tam.
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-08-24 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2024
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|