|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 753) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Tam; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick voting no (2) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 33) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Onishi; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-01-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HSG, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|