|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 542), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-09-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia voting no (1) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 8) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|