|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HOU/PSM, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 155).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cochran, Kila; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 2 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 625) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 02-15-23 9:30AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Re-referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 14
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Recommitted to HSG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 291) as amended in HD 1, recommending recommittal to HSG for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee recommends that the measure pass with amendments, for recommittal for further consideration. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to HSG, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|