Senate
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 229, 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1334).
|
|
|
House
|
07/09/2024
|
Act 229, on 07/09/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1334).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2024
|
Vetoed (Gov. Msg. #1330), various appropriations throughout the bill.
|
|
|
House
|
07/08/2024
|
Vetoed on 07/08/24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1330), line-item appropriations veto.
|
|
|
House
|
06/21/2024
|
Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1158)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2024
|
Notice of Intent to veto dated 06-21-24 (Gov. Msg. No. 1158)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Transmitted to Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 832).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 802).
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pierick excused (1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 2 Excused: Senator(s) Awa, Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 2) 05-03-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Report filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Separated Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Floor Amendment No. 8 offered.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Friday, May 3, 2024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused.
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2024
|
Floor Amendment No. 10 offered by Rep. Yamashita.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 188-24).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday 05-01-24.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 188-24) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 5:45 PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:45 PM; CR 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 4:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-24 2:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 783).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Senate Conferees Changed: Senator Moriwaki added as Co-Chair. Senator Dela Cruz discharged as Co-Chair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 815).
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-25-24 4:30PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 780).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Kitagawa, Alcos.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 2:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 4:00PM in conference room 309.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Moriwaki Chair; Dela Cruz Co-Chair; Fevella.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 971).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Kitagawa, Ward.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 721).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 681) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-06-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1596) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from LBT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1227) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Moriwaki, Lee, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on LBT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to LBT, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 243).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 935), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|