|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from EET/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1318) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, McKelvey, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante, Fukunaga ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Re-Referred to EET/PSM, CPN/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EET/PSM, CPN.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 46).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 309) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-07-23 8:45AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|