12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/14/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1). | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 323) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:15PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |