12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/06/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 62) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | The committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Garcia; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to HUS, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |