12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/28/2023 | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/24/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia voting no (2) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 557) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson, Ward. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:10AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 2 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |