|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Recommitted to CPC with none voting no and Representative(s) Quinlan excused.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Re-referred to CPC, referral sheet 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|