12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/08/2023 | The committee(s) on HSG/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/03/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Re-referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, referral sheet 5 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |