Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Recommitted to Conference Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 2 with none voting no and Representative(s) Hashem, Lowen, Martinez excused.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended CD 2 with none voting no and none excused.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 13 offered by Rep. Hashimoto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 05-04-23
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Report filed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Separated Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor amendment adopted as amended (CD 2) following Roll Call vote: Ayes, 18. Ayes(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. Noes, 7 (Senator(s) Awa, DeCoite, Fevella, Kidani, Kim, McKelvey, Shimabukuro). Excused, 0 (none).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Floor Amendment No. 10 offered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 143).
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-02-23.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 143) as amended in (CD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Rhoads ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) McKelvey; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Tarnas, Yamashita, Aiu, Evslin, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-23 11:15AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-23 11:15AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-26-23 11:15AM in conference room 224.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; McKelvey, Rhoads Co-Chairs; Elefante.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 837).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Tarnas, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Aiu, Evslin, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Re-referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 33
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 767) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara, McKelvey, San Buenaventura. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1830) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-05-23 9:45AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Reported from WTL/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1307) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, San Buenaventura.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Fevella; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
The committee(s) on WTL/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to WTL/GVO, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 68).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Garcia, Hussey-Burdick, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Perruso, Quinlan voting no (4) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 934), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-23-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Garcia, Hussey-Burdick, Matsumoto, Pierick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Amato, Kapela, Marten, Perruso, Quinlan voting no (5) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Reported from HSG/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 444) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashimoto, Aiu, Kila, Kitagawa, Onishi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matsumoto; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Marten; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WAL on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred to HSG/WAL, JHA, referral sheet 8
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to WAL, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|