Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 975).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Rhoads Chair; Elefante, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801).
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas Chair; Takayama, Souza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 512).
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 521) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Fukunaga, Richards). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 03-30-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 03-17-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 178).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 805), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden, Hashimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|