Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Todd, Holt, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Lamosao, Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: Lee Chair; Kim Co-Chair; Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 716) in amended form (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1785) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Kanuha, Shimabukuro.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-23 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1272) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Inouye, Keohokalole, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to TCA, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 248).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1110), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting no (2) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 668), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-15-23 10:30AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on ECD with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela voting no (2) and Representative(s) Amato, Nakashima, Woodson excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to ECD.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, Marten, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Tuesday, 01-31-23 10:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to TRN, ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|