|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to WTL/TCA, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Lamosao, Takenouchi voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kila, Kong voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1130), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Aiu, Garrett, Lamosao, Alcos, Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kila.
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 708) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Re-referred to WAL/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 9
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/EEP on Thursday, 02-09-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to WAL/EEP, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|