|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to AEN/WTL, JDC/WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 342).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 502) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-09-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|