12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/10/2023 | The committee(s) on HLT/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSG on Friday, 02-10-23 11:20AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 02/01/2023 | Re-referred to HLT/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/20/2023 | Pending introduction. |