|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 1:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto, Pierick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia voting no (2) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Lamosao, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Tuesday, 02-07-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to TOU, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|