|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-27-23 10:00AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Woodson, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Todd.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-08-23 2:15PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|