House
|
01/31/2024
|
Re-referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 634) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Martinez, Sayama, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela, Tam; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-14-23 9:30AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LGO with Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 123) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LGO.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Quinlan, Todd, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 02-02-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to EDN, LGO, CPC, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|