|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on EET deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to EET/AEN, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 26).
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 845), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Lowen, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Amato, Belatti, Onishi.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 661), recommending referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2023
|
The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Perruso, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Woodson.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-16-23 9:15AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EEP with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EEP.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
The committee on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Hussey-Burdick, Holt, Kong, Lamosao, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pierick.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Thursday, 02-02-23 10:00AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred to TOU, EEP, CPC, referral sheet 1
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|