12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/06/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Pierick, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Amato, Kila, Todd excused (3). | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 50) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 01/27/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 01-31-23 8:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred to EEP, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/17/2023 | Prefiled. |