12/11/2023 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |||
House | 02/09/2023 | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2). | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 261) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Introduced and Pass First Reading. | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Pending introduction. |