|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 630) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, Garcia.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 213) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to WAL, HET, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|