|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1265) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred to HHS, CPN/JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 186).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991), recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Ganaden, Holt, Hashimoto, Ilagan, Kong, Mizuno, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 733), recommending referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 258) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-08-23 9:45AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|