|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 742) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tam; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-15-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Marten voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-03-23 8:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|