|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-06-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-23 3:02PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to PSM, JDC.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Kila, Lamosao, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Alcos, Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Souza, Ward voting no (6) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aiu, Alcos.
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-23 3:30PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 3:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Alcos, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kong, Pierick, Souza voting no (4) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 775) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Holt, Hashimoto, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Kong, Souza; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ganaden.
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-14-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|