Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 457).
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
House Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 340).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2024
|
Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
|
|
|
|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 839).
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; Garrett, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Kim, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 805) in amended form (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1886) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai, Fevella.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1154) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Referred to EET, WAM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Passed First Reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 376).
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2).
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 940) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-22-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|