|
12/11/2023
|
Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-23-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2023
|
Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 651) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:30AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Introduced and Pass First Reading.
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Pending introduction.
|
|
|