House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato, Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Kapela, Perruso, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1524-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2024
|
The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
To be offered.
|
|
|