LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Hawaii HI
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HCR116
Action History
HI
Hawaii House Bill HCR116
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Hawaii 2024 Regular Session
Hawaii House Bill HCR116
Action History
House
03/20/2024
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
House
03/18/2024
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
House
03/13/2024
Referred to HLT, JHA, referral sheet 21
House
03/08/2024
Offered
House
03/07/2024
To be offered.