House
|
05/03/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 800).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 05-03-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3964) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
The committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-26-24 12:30PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to HHS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 621).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1700-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-24 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1526-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nishimoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-27-24 11:15AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-27-24 at 11:15 AM.
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 21
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|