House
|
05/03/2024
|
Resolution adopted in final form.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2024
|
Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 801).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2024
|
Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
One Day Notice 05-03-24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Reported from TCA/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3962) with recommendation of adoption.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2024
|
The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
The committee(s) on TCA/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2024
|
Re-Referred to TCA/GVO.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Referred to TCA/PSM.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 630).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Transmitted to Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3).
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1664-24), recommending adoption.
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5).
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1509-24), recommending referral to FIN.
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 22
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Offered
|
|
|